EP1153592 - Massage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [2008/07] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Weener Plastik GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1 D-26826 Weener/Ems / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gluth, Peter Tulpenring 22 26826 Weener /Lüchtenborg / DE | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/46] | Wallinger, Michael, Dr.-Ing. Wallinger & Partner, Patentanwälte, Zweibrückenstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108768.1 | 06.04.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | DE2000123417 | 12.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10023417 | [2001/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153592 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1153592 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61H7/00 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
A61H7/001 (EP);
A61H2201/105 (EP);
A61H2201/1284 (EP);
A61H2201/1692 (EP);
A61H2201/1695 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/31] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Massagevorrichtung | [2001/46] | English: | Massage device | [2001/46] | French: | Dispositif de massage | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 29.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Request for further processing for: | 06.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 06.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | IE | 26.08.2009 | IT | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | AT | 06.04.2010 | LU | 06.04.2010 | BE | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
AT | 06.04.2010 | ||
LU | 06.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
AT | 06.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 26.08.2009 | |
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 26.08.2009 | |
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | SE | 26.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE403223 (ESS LAB INC VAN) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US1604435 (EDITH WHARTON) [A] 1,12 * figure 4 *; | [X]DE825136 (PIERRE XAVIER MARC ROCCHISANI) [X] 1-16,18,20-22 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 47; figure 3 * * page 3, line 36 - line 43 * * page 3, line 82 - line 118 *; | [A]DE3500622 (LORENZ & MAYER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* page 5, line 34 - page 7, line 36 * |