EP1167596 - Device and process for manufacturing cord threads by cabling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saurer-Allma GmbH St.Leonhardstrasse 19 87437 Kempten / DE | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osterloh, Markus, Dr. Corneliusweg 38 47918 Tönisvorst / DE | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Rapp, Bertram, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Rapp, Bertram, Dr., et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108806.9 | 07.04.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | DE2000130888 | 23.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10030888 | DE2000130889 | 23.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10030889 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1167596 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/28, D01H13/10 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
D02G3/285 (EP);
D01H13/104 (EP);
D01H7/86 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2002/38] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Cordfadens durch Kablieren | [2002/01] | English: | Device and process for manufacturing cord threads by cabling | [2002/01] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour fabriqué un fil pour cordes par cablage | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 03.07.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.11.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 14.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/31] | 16.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4121913 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [DA] 1-9 * column 4, line 28 - line 67; figures 1-4 *; | [DA]DE29719456U (VOLKMANN GMBH & CO [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 1 *; | [DA]DE9411246U (SAURER ALLMA GMBH [DE]) [DA] * page 2, line 16 - line 20; figures 1,2 * |