EP1147747 - Dental capsule for placement of ultra-high viscosity dental composite material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRIX, INC. 770 River Road Shelton, CT 06484-5458 / US | [2001/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dragan, William B. 85 Burr Street Easton, Connecticut 06612 / US | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108941.4 | 10.04.2001 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | US20000552338 | 19.04.2000 Original published format: US 552338 | US20000605495 | 28.06.2000 Original published format: US 605495 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1147747 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1147747 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/06 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
A61C5/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [2003/42] |
Former [2001/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dentalpatrone zum Abgeben von dentalen ultrahochviskosen Präparaten | [2001/43] | English: | Dental capsule for placement of ultra-high viscosity dental composite material | [2001/43] | French: | Capsule dentaire destinée à l'application de matériaux composés dentaires à très haute viscosité | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 25.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/41] | 12.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5322440 (STEELE CHARLES E [US]) [A] 1,3-6,9,12-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US5871355 (DRAGAN WILLIAM B [US], et al) [A] 1,8* column 4, line 16 - line 27; figure 1 *; | [X]US5938439 (MERTINS JUERGEN [CH], et al) [X] 1-6,9,12,14-19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0948942 (DENTSPLY DETREY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3-7,11 * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 4; figure 1 * | by applicant | US3581399 | US4384853 | US4391590 | US4767326 | US4963093 | US4969816 | US5083921 | US5100320 | US5129825 | US5165890 | US5172807 | US5322440 | US5460523 | US5707234 |