EP1145727 - Pump for sterile feeding of heated tumescence solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Möller Medical GmbH & Co.KG Wasserkuppenstrasse 29-31 36043 Fulda / DE | [2006/24] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Möller Medical GmbH & Co.KG Wasserkuppenstrasse 29-31 36043 Fulda / DE | ||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states European Aesthetics GmbH Lise-Meitner-Strasse 3 85737 Ismaning / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sattler, Gerhard Rosenparkklinik, Heidelberger Landstrasse 20 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Hebing, Norbert, et al Patentanwälte Schlagwein + Hebing Frankfurter Strasse 34 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | Hebing, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Schlagwein + Hebing, Frankfurter Strasse 34 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | ||
Former [2004/04] | Lohr, Georg, Dr. Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Lohr Hauptstrasse 40 82223 Eichenau / DE | ||
Former [2003/50] | Popp, Eugen, Dr. Dr. Münich & Kollegen c/o MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/42] | Münich, Wilhelm, Dr. Dr. Münich & Kollegen Anwaltskanzlei Wilhelm-Mayr-Strasse 11 80689 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01109136.0 | 12.04.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | DE2000117953 | 12.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10017953 | WO2000DE04232 | 28.11.2000 Original published format: PCT/DE00/04232 | [2006/23] |
Former [2001/42] | DE2000117953 | 12.04.2000 | |
DE20004200032 | 28.11.2000 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1145727 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1145727 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/44, A61M1/00, A61M39/12 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
A61M5/14232 (EP,US);
A61M19/00 (EP);
A61M3/0258 (EP,US);
A61M39/08 (EP);
A61M39/12 (EP);
A61M1/77 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/27] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Pumpe zum sterilen Fördern erwärmter Tumeszenzlösung | [2001/42] | English: | Pump for sterile feeding of heated tumescence solution | [2001/42] | French: | Pompe pour la délivrance sous condition stérile de solution tumescente chauffée | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 20.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Request for further processing for: | 05.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 06.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.12.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.10.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.06.2006 | FI | 14.06.2006 | FR | 14.06.2006 | GB | 14.06.2006 | IE | 14.06.2006 | IT | 14.06.2006 | NL | 14.06.2006 | PT | 14.06.2006 | TR | 14.06.2006 | DK | 14.09.2006 | SE | 14.09.2006 | GR | 15.09.2006 | ES | 25.09.2006 | [2011/46] |
Former [2009/42] | CY | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
FR | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
TR | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
Former [2009/37] | CY | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
FR | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/52] | FI | 14.06.2006 | |
FR | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 14.06.2006 | |
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
FR | 09.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 14.06.2006 | |
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 14.06.2006 | |
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 14.06.2006 | |
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 14.06.2006 | |
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 14.06.2006 | |
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 14.06.2006 | |
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 14.06.2006 | |
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 14.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4798590 (O'LEARY WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]US5178606 (OGNIER JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, lines 24-36,48-53 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5244463 (CORDNER JR EDWARD T [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 2; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5395320 (PADDA SHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 4, lines 41-43; figure 5 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 7 * * column 8, lines 5-22; figures 4,7; claim 1 *; | [A]RU2039575 (ZAVOROTNYJ ALEKSANDR I [RU], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5447493 (BLUGERMAN GUILLERMO S [AR], et al) [Y] 9-11 * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 4; figures 1,2A,2B *; | [Y]FR2753103 (CONSEILRAY SA [CH]) [Y] 4 * page 9, lines 9-16 * * page 10, line 32 - page 12, line 4; figures 9,12 *; | [Y]US6039048 (SILBERG BARRY [US]) [Y] 1-6,9-11 * column 1, lines 63-66 * * column 2, lines 9-13 * * figure 5 * |