EP1158535 - Nonvolatile semiconductor memory device having electrically and collectively erasable characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akaogi, Takao Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Takashina, Nobuaki Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Kasa, Yasushi Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Itano, Kiyoshi Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Kawashima, Hiromi Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 06 /
Yamashita, Minoru Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 07 /
Kawamura, Shouichi Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01109455.4 | 25.06.1993 | [2001/48] | Priority number, date | JP19930000304 | 05.01.1993 Original published format: JP 30493 | JP19920324284 | 03.12.1992 Original published format: JP 32428492 | JP19920349481 | 28.12.1992 Original published format: JP 34948192 | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1158535 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1158535 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/34 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
G11C29/80 (EP,US);
G11C29/00 (KR);
G11C16/06 (KR);
G11C16/08 (EP,US);
G11C16/10 (EP,US);
G11C16/107 (EP,US);
G11C16/12 (EP,US);
G11C16/16 (EP,US);
G11C16/26 (EP,US);
G11C16/30 (EP,US);
G11C16/3404 (EP,US);
G11C16/3409 (EP,US);
G11C16/3436 (EP,US);
G11C16/3445 (EP,US);
G11C16/3459 (EP,US);
G11C16/3472 (EP,US);
G11C16/3481 (EP,US);
G11C29/028 (EP,US);
G11C29/34 (EP,US);
G11C29/46 (EP,US);
G11C29/50 (EP,US);
G11C29/50004 (EP,US);
G11C29/802 (EP,US);
G11C29/82 (EP,US);
G11C5/145 (EP,US);
G11C7/067 (EP,US);
G11C8/00 (EP,US);
G11C8/08 (EP,US);
G11C8/10 (EP,US);
G11C16/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/48] | G11C16/16, G11C16/34 | Designated contracting states | [2003/19] |
Former [2001/48] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Nichtflüchtiger Halbleiterspeicher mit elektrisch und gemeinsam löschbaren Eigenschaften | [2001/48] | English: | Nonvolatile semiconductor memory device having electrically and collectively erasable characteristics | [2001/48] | French: | Mémoire non-volatile à semi-conducteur à caractéristiques effacables électriquement et collectivement | [2001/48] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/47] | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93110192.7 / EP0600151 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.03.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.03.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0501289 (SUNDISK CORP [US]) [X] 1,3 * page 5, line 19 - line 35; claims 1,2,7 * [Y] 2; | [Y]GB2215156 (INTEL CORP [US]) [Y] 2 * page 16, line 16 - line 24; figure 6 * |