EP1153918 - Process for the preparation of piperidines from pyridines using catalytic hydrogenation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Chemicals AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2004/01] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giffels, Guido, Dr. Max-Franz-Strasse 4 53177 Bonn / DE | 02 /
Diehl, Herbert, Dr. Geibelstrasse 12 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Martin, Georg, Dr. Von Galenstrasse 2 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 04 /
Frohn, Lutz, Dr. Leibnizstrasse 62a 40699 Erkrath / DE | 05 /
Hammerschmidt, Erich, Dr. Hebborner Strasse 95 51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2001/46] | Application number, filing date | 01109476.0 | 25.04.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | DE2000122369 | 08.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10022369 | [2001/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153918 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1153918 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/02, C07D211/60, C07D471/04 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D211/60 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/44 (KR);
C07D211/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/34 (KR);
C07D213/54 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/31] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Piperidinen durch katalytische Hydrierung von Pyridinen | [2001/46] | English: | Process for the preparation of piperidines from pyridines using catalytic hydrogenation | [2001/46] | French: | Procédé de préparation des piperidines par hydrogénation catalytique des pyridines | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 25.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 08.09.2004 | IE | 08.09.2004 | TR | 08.09.2004 | GR | 08.12.2004 | PT | 08.02.2005 | CY | 25.04.2005 | LU | 25.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/27] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
TR | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
CY | 25.04.2005 | ||
LU | 25.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
TR | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
CY | 25.04.2005 | ||
LU | 25.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
TR | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
CY | 25.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
TR | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
TR | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 08.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0350733 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1-8* example K *; | [X]US5942104 (MILLER STEPHEN J [US]) [X] 1-8 * example 4 * |