EP1149692 - An automobile interior headliner molding or forming member and an automobile interior headliner member using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OJI Interpack Co. Ltd. 1306 Aoyama Bldg., 2-3 Kita-Aoyama 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/22] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Honshu International Packaging Co. Ltd. 1306 Aoyama Bldg., 2-3 Kita-Aoyama 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamagata, Shigeru 3-1-308, Higashi-shinozaki 2-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sakurabashi, Ryoetsu 14-11-II-101, Koedo 3-chome Utsunomiya-shi, Tochigiken / JP | 03 /
Yagi, Hisanori 3-1-304, Higashi-shinozaki 2-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ogata, Mitsutoshi 471-38, Ryubuse, Kawauchi-machi Kawauchi-gun, Tochigiken / JP | 05 /
Kojima, Akihiko 530-1-307, Hongo-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Wood, Graham, et al Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Wood, Graham, et al Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | ||
Former [2001/44] | Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01109560.1 | 18.04.2001 | [2001/44] | Priority number, date | JP20000122175 | 24.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000122175 | JP20000385429 | 19.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000385429 | [2001/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1149692 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1149692 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1149692 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32, B60R13/02, B32B27/20 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
B60R13/02 (EP);
B32B19/02 (KR);
B32B19/047 (KR);
B32B7/12 (KR);
B32B2266/025 (KR);
B32B2323/10 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2001/44] | B32B27/32, B60R13/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/02] |
Former [2001/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugdachverkleidungbildendes Element und eine dieses verwendende Fahrzeugdachverkleidung | [2001/44] | English: | An automobile interior headliner molding or forming member and an automobile interior headliner member using the same | [2001/44] | French: | Elément formant un rêtement intérieur de toit pour véhicules et rêtement interieur de toit pour véhicules l'utilisant | [2001/44] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 17.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 01.09.2005 | [2005/50] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4320636 (YMOS AG IND PRODUKTE [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0708146 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *;; table 6 *; | [A]DE19544451 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19835612 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [A] 1-16 * figure 1; example 1; claim - * |