EP1156004 - Folding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neumann, Fred Silcherstrasse 10 71732 Tamm / DE | 02 /
Hechler, Hatto, Dr. Fridinger Strasse 13A 70619 Stuttgart / DE | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Fey, Hans-Jürgen, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Fey, Hans-Jürgen, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2001/47] | Duschl, Edgar Johannes, Dr., et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01110177.1 | 07.05.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | DE2000123594 | 15.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10023594 | [2001/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1156004 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1156004 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1156004 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/12 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
B65H45/12 (EP,US);
B65H45/28 (EP,US);
B65H2402/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/48] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Falzapparat | [2001/47] | English: | Folding apparatus | [2001/47] | French: | Appareil de pliage | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 14.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.07.2006 | FI | 12.07.2006 | FR | 12.07.2006 | GB | 12.07.2006 | IE | 12.07.2006 | IT | 12.07.2006 | NL | 12.07.2006 | TR | 12.07.2006 | DK | 12.10.2006 | SE | 12.10.2006 | GR | 13.10.2006 | ES | 23.10.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
FR | 12.07.2006 | ||
GB | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 12.07.2006 | |
FR | 12.07.2006 | ||
GB | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 12.07.2006 | |
GB | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 12.07.2006 | |
GB | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 12.07.2006 | |
GB | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 12.07.2006 | |
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 12.07.2006 | |
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 12.07.2006 | |
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 12.07.2006 | |
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 12.07.2006 | |
SE | 12.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1080050 (GUNTER MATTKA) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]DE1436596 (MATTKA GUENTER) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [XAY]EP0153668 (STAHL GMBH & CO MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1-4,17 * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 13; figure 3 * [A] 6-16 [Y] 5; | [XAY]DE4332792 (ZIRKON DRUCKMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,17 * column 3, line 18 - column 5, line 19 * [A] 4,6-16 [Y] 5 |