EP1156601 - Random access control method for CMDA system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakada, Suguru NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/47] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01110371.0 | 26.04.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | JP20000146752 | 18.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000146752 | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1156601 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1156601 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1156601 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04Q7/38, H04B1/707 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
H04B7/2628 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/47] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/35] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Zufallzugriffsteuerung für CDMA System | [2001/47] | English: | Random access control method for CMDA system | [2001/47] | French: | Méthode de commande d'accès aléatoire pour système CDMA | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 20.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0760564 (TELIA AB [SE]) [A] 1-7* page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 35 *; | [A] - CHUAH M ET AL, "Access priority schemes in UMTS MAC", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 1999. WCNC. 1999 IEEE NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA 21-24 SEPT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990921), ISBN 0-7803-5668-3, pages 781 - 786, XP010353545 [A] 1-7 * page 782, column L, line 23 - column R, line 27 * * page 783, column L, line 39 - column R, line 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCNC.1999.796757 |