EP1254829 - Actuator device for operating a motorcycle stand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doveri, Marco 18, Via XXIV Maggio 56025 Pontedera (Pisa) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Doveri, Marco 18, Via XXIV Maggio I-56025 Pontedera (Pisa) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Celestino, Marco ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Celestino, Marco ABM, Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | Application number, filing date | 01110636.6 | 30.04.2001 | [2002/45] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1254829 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B62H1/02 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
B62H1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Extension states | SI | 29.04.2003 | Title | German: | Gesteuerter Motorradständer | [2002/45] | English: | Actuator device for operating a motorcycle stand | [2002/45] | French: | Dispositif actionneur pour la mise en oeuvre des béquilles de motocyclette | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/24] | 20.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 27.04.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9947407 (DOVERI MARCO [IT]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2748982 (HERVE PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4223906 (GRATZA PETER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2678573 (MIRAMOND JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2913429 (FISCHER GUENTER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2771368 (LEROY JEAN PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9947407 |