EP1153876 - Method for protecting a mobile crane against an overload [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Werk Nenzing GmbH Tschalenga 3 6710 Nenzing / AT | [2001/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Josef Kaspar Mozartstrasse 15 6845 Hohenems / AT | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01110674.7 | 02.05.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | DE2000123418 | 12.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10023418 | [2001/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1153876 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1153876 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1153876 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/90 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
B66C23/905 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Überlastsicherung eines mobilen Kranes | [2001/46] | English: | Method for protecting a mobile crane against an overload | [2001/46] | French: | Procédé pour protéger une grue mobile contre une surcharge | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 14.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.11.2006 | FI | 15.11.2006 | IE | 15.11.2006 | TR | 15.11.2006 | DK | 15.02.2007 | SE | 15.02.2007 | GR | 16.02.2007 | PT | 16.04.2007 | AT | 02.05.2007 | LU | 02.05.2007 | CH | 31.05.2007 | LI | 31.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 15.11.2006 | |
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
AT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LU | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
AT | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
SE | 15.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3420596 (PIETZSCH LUDWIG GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 17 - line 37; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0614845 (KATO SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,4* figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5731974 (PIETZSCH HEINZ WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * column 4, line 31 - column 6, line 25; figure - * |