EP1130847 - Network analysis method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company (a Delaware Corporation) 3000 Hanover Street Palo ALto CA 94304 / US | ||
For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | |||
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company (a Delaware corporation) 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | |||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | |||
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McKee, Neil 27 Longmead Avenue Horfield, Bristol, BS7 8QB / GB | 02 /
Phaal, Peter 25 The Valls Bradley Stoke, Bristol, BS12 8AW / GB | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Squibbs, Robert Francis Hewlett-Packard Limited IP Section, Building 3 Filton Road Stoke Gifford, Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Squibbs, Robert Francis Hewlett-Packard Limited IP Section Building 3 Filton Road Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01110834.7 | 08.03.1993 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130847 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130847 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | [2002/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1130847 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
H04Q3/0087 (EP,US);
H04L43/0811 (EP,US);
H04L43/0876 (EP,US);
H04L43/091 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0083 (EP,US);
H04L41/5093 (EP,US);
H04L43/16 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13164 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13166 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13349 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13504 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/14] |
Former [2001/36] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Netzwerkanalyseverfahren | [2001/36] | English: | Network analysis method | [2001/36] | French: | Méthode d'analyse de réseau | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 27.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93301715.4 / EP0615362 | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0480555 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [AD] 1* claims 1-6 *; | [A] - BOULOUTAS A ET AL, "Some graph partitioning problems and algorithms related to routing in large computer networks", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS. NEWPORT BEACH, JUNE 5 - 9, 1989, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS, WASHINGTON, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19890605), vol. CONF. 9, ISBN 0-8186-1953-8, pages 362 - 370, XP010016560 [A] 1-8 * page 363, column R, line 29 - line 44 * * page 364, column L, line 26 - line 35 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDCS.1989.37966 | [A] - KAR G ET AL, "HEURISTIC LAYOUT ALGORITHMS FOR NETWORK MANAGEMENT PRESENTATION SERVICES", IEEE NETWORK, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (198811), vol. 2, no. 6, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 29 - 36, XP000811982 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.10027 |