EP1155871 - Method for treating re-usable printing plates or cylinders in printing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2001/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jentzsch, Arndt Auerstrasse 208 01640 Coswig / DE | 02 /
Patzelt, Bernd Kantstrasse 16 09126 Chemnitz / DE | [2001/47] | Application number, filing date | 01111023.6 | 08.05.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | DE2000124184 | 15.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10024184 | [2001/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1155871 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1155871 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1155871 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41N3/00 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
B41N3/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/20] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Behandeln von erneut bebilderbaren Druckformen oder Druckformzylindern in Druckmaschinen | [2001/47] | English: | Method for treating re-usable printing plates or cylinders in printing machines | [2001/47] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement de plaques d'impression réutilisables ou de cylindres dans les presses | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 23.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 11.08.2004 | IE | 11.08.2004 | NL | 11.08.2004 | TR | 11.08.2004 | DK | 11.11.2004 | GR | 11.11.2004 | SE | 11.11.2004 | ES | 22.11.2004 | PT | 11.01.2005 | AT | 08.05.2005 | CY | 08.05.2005 | LU | 08.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
AT | 08.05.2005 | ||
CY | 08.05.2005 | ||
LU | 08.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
AT | 08.05.2005 | ||
CY | 08.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
AT | 08.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/43] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
AT | 08.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 11.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000015770 ; | [A]US4729310 (LOVE III FRANKLIN S [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 6, line 4 - line 62 * * column 11, line 14 - line 19 * * column 13, line 23 - line 36 * * column 14, line 45 - line 64 * * column 19, line 8 - line 13 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000015770 A 20000118 (THINK LABORATORY CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |