EP1156073 - Shaped article of polyamide resin and production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Kazunobu, Mitsubishi Gas Chem Comp. Inc. Hiratsuka Research Lab., 6-2 Higashiyahata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Koji, Mitsubishi Gas Chem Comp. Inc. Hiratsuka Research Lab., 6-2 Higashiyahata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Maruo, Kazunobu, Mitsubishi Gas Chem Comp. Inc. Hiratsuka Research Lab., 6-2 Higashiyahata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Okada, Satoshi, Mitsubishi Gas Chem Comp. Inc. Hiratsuka Research Lab., 6-2 Higashiyahata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111225.7 | 15.05.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | JP20000147929 | 19.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000147929 | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1156073 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1156073 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/22, C08K9/04, C08L77/06 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
C08J3/226 (EP,US);
C08K9/04 (EP,US);
C08J2377/00 (EP,US);
C08J2477/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1321 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249921 (EP,US);
Y10T428/251 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/268 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K9/04, C08L77/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2002/32] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Geformter Gegenstand aus Polyamidharz und seine Herstellung | [2001/47] | English: | Shaped article of polyamide resin and production thereof | [2001/47] | French: | Article moulé à base de résine de polyamide et méthode pour sa fabrication | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 27.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0398551 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* page 6, line 22 - line 26; claims 1,3,12 *; | [A]WO0009605 (AMCOL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,25 * |