EP1154157 - Pulsation damping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 11-48 Nonakaminami 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [2010/44] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 11-48 Nonakaminami 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minato, Yoji, Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd. Sanda Factory, 541-1, Aza-Utsuba, Shimouchigami Sanda-shi, Hyogo / JP | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/46] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111349.5 | 09.05.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | JP20000137572 | 10.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000137572 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1154157 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1154157 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154157 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04B11/00 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
F04B11/0016 (EP,US);
F04B11/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/09] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Druckpulsationsdämpfer | [2001/46] | English: | Pulsation damping device | [2001/46] | French: | Amortisseur de pulsations | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0617752 ; | [AD]JPH08159016 ; | [A]EP0943799 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP]) [A] 1-32 * column 2, line 56 - column 7, line 41 *; | [A]US5205326 (PALEY EDWARD D [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 25 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940425), vol. 018, no. 227, Database accession no. (M - 1597), & JP06017752 A 19940125 (IWAKI:KK) [AD] 1 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08159016 A 19960618 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO LTD) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0617752 | JPH08159016 |