EP1158612 - Telecommunications connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Channell Limited Murray Road, Leesons Hill Orpington Kent BR5 3QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Channell Limited Murray Road, Leesons Hill Orpington, Kent BR5 3QU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimirak, Gerald-Leu 6008 Misty Ridge Road Holly Springs, North Carolina 27540 / US | 02 /
Bennett, Andrew Philip 151 Moordown, Shooters Hill London SE18 3NA / GB | 03 /
Escane, Richard 187 Crescent Drive Petts Wood, Kent BR5 3QU / GB | 04 /
Sheals, Derec Ian 8 Devonshire Avenue Dartford, Kent DA1 3DW / GB | 05 /
Sinigiani, Henry John 1818 Randall Road San Mateo, California 94402 / US | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massett Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massett Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/48] | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Fry Heath & Spence, The Old College, 53 High Street Horley, Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 01111928.6 | 18.05.2001 | [2001/48] | Priority number, date | GB20000012484 | 24.05.2000 Original published format: GB 0012484 | GB20000022436 | 13.09.2000 Original published format: GB 0022436 | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1158612 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1158612 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1158612 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/24, H01R13/703, H01R31/08 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
H01R13/7032 (EP);
H01R31/085 (EP);
H01R12/52 (EP);
H01R13/112 (EP);
H01R2201/16 (EP);
H01R4/2429 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/48] | H01R4/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/48] | Title | German: | Steckverbinder für die Telekommunikation | [2001/48] | English: | Telecommunications connector | [2001/48] | French: | Connecteur pour la télécommunication | [2001/48] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04012658.3 / EP1450450 | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.01.2005 | CH | 26.01.2005 | LI | 26.01.2005 | NL | 26.01.2005 | TR | 26.01.2005 | DK | 26.04.2005 | GR | 26.04.2005 | CY | 18.05.2005 | LU | 18.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2009/42] |
Former [2007/27] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
CY | 18.05.2005 | ||
LU | 18.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
CY | 18.05.2005 | ||
LU | 18.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
CY | 18.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 26.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2524723 (CTM [FR]) [A] 1* page 4, line 9 - line 20; figure 3 *; | [A]GB2201846 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * page 3 - page 4; figure 4 *; | [X]US5802170 (SMITH THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 6, line 34 - column 7, line 26; figure 11 * |