EP1157656 - Device for subjective measurement of ocular convergence [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Lorenzo, Dario Via S. D'Acquisto, 16/9 35027 Noventa Padovana (Prov. of Padova) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states De Lorenzo, Dario Via S. D'Acquisto, 16/9 35027 Noventa Padovana, (Prov. of Padova) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01111999.7 | 22.05.2001 | [2001/48] | Priority number, date | IT2000PD00142 | 26.05.2000 Original published format: IT PD000142 | [2001/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1157656 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/04, A61B3/09 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
A61B3/09 (EP);
A61B3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/33] |
Former [2001/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur subjektiven Messung der okularen Konvergenz | [2001/48] | English: | Device for subjective measurement of ocular convergence | [2001/48] | French: | Dispositif pour déterminer de manière subjective la convergence oculaire | [2001/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/10] | 02.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.07.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.07.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4055900 (GROLMAN BERNARD, et al) [Y] 1,2,4,8,9 * column 1, line 61 - column 3, line 58 *; | [Y]US4494837 (BOMMARITO PAUL F [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,8,9 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 25 *; | [A]US4988185 (FEINBLOOM RICHARD E [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5037193 (FUNK WILLIAM F [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,8,9 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 53 *; | [Y]FR2686011 (PRUVOT PATRICK [FR]) [Y] 1,2,4,8,9 * column W *; | [A]US5461434 (BLATTBERG MARTIN M [US]) [A] 1-9* column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 29 * |