EP1159887 - Foldable table [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steelcase Werndl Aktiengesellschaft Georg-Aicher-Strasse 7 83026 Rosenheim / DE | [2002/22] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Werndl BüroMöbel AG Georg-Aicher-Strasse 7 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rutz, Josef Talweg 6 83026 Rosenheim / DE | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | ||
Former [2001/49] | Flach, Dieter Dipl.-Ing, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112148.0 | 17.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | DE2000125338 | 23.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10025338 | [2001/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159887 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159887 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47B3/00, A47B3/08 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
A47B3/0803 (EP);
A47B3/08 (EP);
A47B7/02 (EP);
A47B2200/0013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/49] | Title | German: | Klapptisch | [2001/49] | English: | Foldable table | [2001/49] | French: | Table pliable | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.10.2003 | FI | 29.10.2003 | IE | 29.10.2003 | TR | 29.10.2003 | DK | 29.01.2004 | GR | 29.01.2004 | SE | 29.01.2004 | ES | 09.02.2004 | PT | 29.03.2004 | AT | 17.05.2004 | LU | 17.05.2004 | BE | 31.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | CY | 29.10.2003 | |
FI | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
TR | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
AT | 17.05.2004 | ||
LU | 17.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
TR | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
AT | 17.05.2004 | ||
LU | 17.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
AT | 17.05.2004 | ||
LU | 17.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
LU | 17.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
LU | 17.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 29.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9417585U (WESTLING GOESTA [SE]) [A] 1-17* page 2, paragraph 2; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]WO0010426 (WILKHAHN WILKENING & HAHNE [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,10-17 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 3 * * figures 1,3-5,10,18,19 * [A] 6-9; | [A]DE19837987 (WILKHAHN WILKENING & HAHNE [DE]) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 26 - line 28 * * column 3, line 46 - line 55; figures 1-5,7-9 * |