EP1167252 - Vehicle for bulk transport [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.Ochsner AG Steinackerstrasse 31 8902 Urdorf / CH | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinebrunner, Ottmar Kastel 42 79677 Fröhnd / DE | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112258.7 | 18.05.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | DE2000130127 | 20.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10030127 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1167252 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1167252 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65F3/02 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
B65F3/0203 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/01] | B65G67/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/01] | Title | German: | Schüttguttransportfahrzeug | [2002/01] | English: | Vehicle for bulk transport | [2002/01] | French: | Véhicule pour transporter des matériaux en vrac | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 24.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.01.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9107172U (F. SCHMÄDEKE) [X] 1-4* the whole document *; | [XA]NL1002518C (GEESINK BV [NL]) [X] 1-4,8 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 27 * * figure 1 * [A] 5; | [X]EP0763487 (GEESINK BV [NL]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 25 - column 5, line 52; figures 1-6 * |