EP1199781 - Isolated screw connector for power cables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellpack AG Anglikerstrasse 99 5612 Villmergen / CH | [2003/06] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states CELLPACK AG Zentralstrasse 17 CH-5610 Wohlen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pilling, Jürgen. Siedlung 16 D-02794 Spitzkunnersdorf / DE | 02 /
Schoenemann, Thomas. Dänkelbachweg 15 CH-5426 Lengnau / CH | 03 /
Hardt, Falk. Walsteinstr 61 D-95213 Münchberg / DE | 04 /
Wenske, Günter. Langebrücker Str 128 D-01465 Liegau-Agustusbad / DE | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Heyner, Klaus Mittelweg 1h 01728 Bannewitz/Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Heyner, Klaus, Dr.-Ing. Mittelweg 1h 01728 Bannewitz/Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112445.0 | 22.05.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | DE2000126091 | 26.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10026091 | [2002/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1199781 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1199781 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/08, H02G15/103, H02G15/184 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
H02G15/184 (EP);
A47F5/0018 (EP);
A47F5/16 (EP);
A47F7/0021 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/17] | H02G15/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/17] | Title | German: | Isolierter Schraubverbinder für Energiekabel | [2002/17] | English: | Isolated screw connector for power cables | [2002/17] | French: | Connecteur à vis pour câbles d'alimentation | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 16.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/22] | 03.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3350677 (DAUM LEONARD E) [A] 1-3,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US3864013 (LEVY SIDNEY) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US4466690 (OSYPKA PETER [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US6049960 (PILLING JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 10* the whole document * |