EP1159904 - Automatic high energy saving cooker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLY INNOVATION Room "F", Ho Lee Commercial Building, 3rd Floor, 38-44 D'Aguilar Street Central / HK | [2001/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ng, Andrew 1/Floor, 84 Po Wah Yen Yung Shue Wan, Lamma Island / HK | 02 /
Ng, Wing Tong 2B Headland Shek O / HK | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112736.2 | 25.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | US20000580469 | 26.05.2000 Original published format: US 580469 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1159904 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1159904 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/08 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
A47J27/086 (EP,US);
A47J27/0802 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/30] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Automatischer Energiesparender Dampfdruckkocher | [2001/49] | English: | Automatic high energy saving cooker | [2001/49] | French: | Autocuiseur automatique économiseur d'énergie | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 03.05.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/01] | 18.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.06.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE559955 (ANDREA RICCARDO PAGANO) [X] 33-36,40 * page 1, line 21 - line 60; figures 1,2 * [Y] 37-39; | [Y]DE920094 (KURT BELLINO & CO K G DR) [Y] 37 * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 80; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]FR1218731 (ARROW) [Y] 38,39* page 1, line 7 - line 15; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB1436269 (CHEMETRON CORP) [Y] 15-18 * page 3, line 102 - line 105 *; | [Y]DE2722675 (KARL PRINZ AG) [Y] 9,10 * page 4, paragraph 1 *; | [XY]US4608260 (ANDRE WOLFRAM K [DE]) [X] 1-4,28-32 * column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 61; figures 5,6 * [Y] 5-10,13-27; | [Y]DE3510542 (SILIT WERKE [DE]) [Y] 13,14,19-27 * column 4, line 6 - column 4, line 43; figures 1,4 *; | [Y]GB2217629 (MERWOOD LTD [GB]) [Y] 5,6,8,19 * page 4, line 16 - line 30; figure 1 * * page 11, line 17 - line 21 * * page 16, line 3 - line 6 *; | [YD]US5727448 (SA YONG-JAE [KR]) [YD] 7 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0919169 (GUANGDONG RONGSHENG ELECTRIC H [CN]) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 32; figure 1 * * column 4, line 18 - line 23 * | by applicant | US3908111 | US4315139 | US4421974 | US4587405 | US4591698 | US5031519 | US5567458 | US5643485 | US5717448 | US5839357 |