EP1160053 - Machine tool with chip conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mori Seiki Co., Ltd. 106 Kitakoriyama-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara 639-1160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Mori Seiki Co., Ltd. 106 Kitakoriyama-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara 639-1160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakai, Masateru Mori Seiki Co., Ltd., 106, Kitakoriyama-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara 639-1160 / JP | 02 /
Kamei, Toshihde Mori Seiki Co., Ltd., 106, Kitakoriyama-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara 639-1160 / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Haruki Mori Seiki Co., Ltd., 106, Kitakoriyama-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara 639-1160 / JP | 04 /
Oguma, Masahiro Mori Seiki Co., Ltd., 106, Kitakoriyama-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara 639-1160 / JP | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112895.6 | 01.06.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | JP20000165941 | 02.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000165941 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1160053 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1160053 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/00, B23Q1/66 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
B23Q1/66 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0053 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0057 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5196 (EP,US);
Y10T409/304088 (EP,US);
Y10T82/25 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2566 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/49] | B23Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/17] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Werkzeugmaschine mit Späneförderer | [2001/49] | English: | Machine tool with chip conveyor | [2001/49] | French: | Machine-outil avec tranporteur de copeaux | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 07.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/26] | 24.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5940948 (REHM KARL [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 24 - line 31 * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 28 - line 38 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]SU880689 ; | [XA]GB1240796 (WERKZEUGMASCH HECKERT VEB [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 11 - line 22 * * page 2, line 73 - line 74 * * page 2, line 84 - line 122 * * figure - * [A] 2; | [A]JPS6389249 ; | [A]CH654237 (ZISWILER ENGINEERING NIDAU) [A] 1,2 * page 3, column L, line 60 - column R, line 8 * * page 3, column R, line 46 - page 4, column L, line 7 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9906176 (EX CELL O GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 18 - line 24 * * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 4 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 4 * * page 7, line 25 - line 35 * * page 8, line 12 - line 18 * * page 9, line 25 - line 34 * * figure - *; | [A]JPH09309611 ; | [A]EP0913228 (MAKINO MILLING MACHINE [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 7 - line 42 * * column 5, line 24 - line 32 * * figure - *; | [A]US4673076 (MATTSON CLYDE E [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 4 - line 37 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3444620 (ROEMHELD A GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3709384 (WILLIAMSON D, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 52 - line 66 * * figures 1,10 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 38, Database accession no. 1982-M5271E, XP002243011 & SU880689 A 19811115 (IVAN REAMING TOOLS) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880831), vol. 012, no. 321, Database accession no. (M - 736), & JP63089249 A 19880420 (MAKINO MILLING MACH CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 07, Database accession no. 1998-071637, XP002243012 & JPH09309611 A 19971202 (MUTO M) [A] 2 * abstract * |