EP1162495 - Substrate for reflection type liquid crystal display element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8559 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogino, Etsuo, Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | 02 /
Ikadai, Masahiro, Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2001/50] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte GbR, Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112961.6 | 07.06.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | JP20000170518 | 07.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000170518 | JP20000260501 | 30.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000260501 | JP20010110183 | 09.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001110183 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1162495 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1162495 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335, G02B5/08 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
G02F1/133553 (EP,KR,US);
G02F2201/346 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/34] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Substrat für ein reflektierendes Flüssigkristallanzeigeelement | [2001/50] | English: | Substrate for reflection type liquid crystal display element | [2001/50] | French: | Substrat pour un élément réflectif d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 21.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.07.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.07.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5799231 (GATES STEPHEN MCCONNELL [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 17 - line 63 * * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 2 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0867733 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * claim 1 * * page 6, line 13 - line 25 *; | [A]WO9936811 (CIENA CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 7 ** page 4, line 15 - line 26 *; | [A]EP0971246 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 10 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0083] *; | [A]WO0027771 (PPG IND OHIO INC [US]) [A] 8 * page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 3 *; | [X] - MATUSCHEK N ET AL, "Theory of double-chirped mirrors", IEEE JOURNAL OF SELECTED TOPICS IN QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, US, (199803), vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 1077-260X, pages 197 - 208, XP002109797 [X] 1-10 * I. Introduction, figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2944.686724 |