EP1162281 - Continous single stage process for the production of molybdenum metal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harper International Corp. West Drullard Avenue Lancaster, NY 14086 / US | [2001/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCormik, Edward V. 118 O Brien Road Churchville, NY 14428 / US | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Puschmann & Borchert Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112967.3 | 07.06.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | US20000210501P | 09.06.2000 Original published format: US 210501 P | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1162281 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C22B34/34 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
C22B34/34 (EP);
C22B5/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/50] | Title | German: | Kontinuierliches Einstufenverfahren zur Herstellung metallisches Molybdäns | [2001/50] | English: | Continous single stage process for the production of molybdenum metal | [2001/50] | French: | Procédé en une étape et en continu pour la production de molybdène métallique | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 03.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/27] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19622097 (TREIBACHER IND AG [AT]) [Y] 1-8 * column 2, line 19 - line 52 * * column 3, line 6 - line 21 * * claims 5,8-11 *; | [Y]US2402084 (FREDRIK RENNIE ROBERT) [Y] 1-8 * column 1, line 1 - line 28 * * column 2, line 23 - line 53 * * column 3, line 17 - line 47 * * column 4, line 13 - line 73 * * column 5, line 40 - line 75 * * figure 1; claims 1-4,11,12 *; | [A]US3865573 (NEUMANN NORBERT F, et al) [A] 1,5-7 * example 1; claims 1-4 *; | [A]GB932168 (MASASHI OKAGE) [A] 1-3,5,6 * page 1, line 8 - line 47; claim - *; | [A]DD74082 (BREM H. E.A.) [A] 1,5-7 * column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 2 * * column 3, line 4 - line 21 * |