EP1162511 - Developer for electrostatic image development and image forming method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isonaka, Takeshi 1-102-2-207, Sugaya Ageo-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Kogawara, Toshiro 5085-1, Iwatsuki Iwatsuki-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Ohba, Katsunori 3-12-21-1-306, Otome Oyama-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP | 04 /
Amaya, Shinji 1-4-1-604, Minamiurawa Saitama-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus, Weisert & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112989.7 | 08.06.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | JP20000173579 | 09.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000173579 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1162511 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1162511 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1162511 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/113, G03G9/107 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
G03G9/09733 (EP,US);
G03G9/113 (KR);
G03G9/0906 (EP,US);
G03G9/09741 (EP,US);
G03G9/0975 (EP,US);
G03G9/10 (EP,KR,US);
G03G9/1075 (EP,US);
G03G9/1131 (EP,US);
G03G9/1132 (EP,US);
G03G9/1139 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/34] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Entwickler für die elektrostatische Bildentwicklung und Bildherstellungsverfahren | [2001/50] | English: | Developer for electrostatic image development and image forming method using the same | [2001/50] | French: | Révélateur pour le développement d'images électrostatiques et méthode de formation d'image l'utilisant | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 11.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JPH08179570 ; | [Y]EP0800118 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7* figure 1; claims 1,15 *; | [Y]US5733699 (ASANAE MASUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * claim 1 * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08179570 A 19960712 (RICOH) [DY] 1-7 * abstract * |