EP1191502 - Monitoring system for airport lighting devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADB Airfield Solutions GmbH & Co. KG Von-der-Tann-Strasse 30 90439 Nürnberg / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bete, Manfred Lange Zeile 135 D-91054 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Helmut Waldstrasse 10D D-91341 Röttenbach / DE | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Pronovem Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | pronovem Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2010/07] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG CT IP EHC Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113067.1 | 29.05.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | DE2000126923 | 30.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10026923 | [2002/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1191502 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/00 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
G08G5/0026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/13] | Extension states | SI | 22.04.2002 | Title | German: | Leitsystem für Flugplatzbefeuerungsanlagen | [2002/13] | English: | Monitoring system for airport lighting devices | [2002/13] | French: | Système de contrôle d'appareils d'éclairage pour aéroport | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 24.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 13.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9914989 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4933668 (OYER MICHAEL W [US], et al); | [A]US5426429 (NORMAN ROLF [SE], et al) | by applicant | DE19750560 | DE29912811U | DE29823494U | US5426429 | US4933668 | WO9914989 |