EP1177940 - Vehicle turn signal cancel device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Stuttgarter Strasse 119 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2002/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Papenfuss, Jürgen Gutenbergstrasse 14/2 74343 Sachsenheim / DE | 02 /
Machalitzky, Otto Frimleystrasse 50/2 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 03 /
Hecht, Walter Fichtestrasse 8 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113244.6 | 31.05.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | DE2000137586 | 02.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10037586 | [2002/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1177940 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1177940 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | [2007/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177940 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/42 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
B60Q1/425 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/51] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Rückstellvorrichtung für einen Blinkerschalter in Kraftfahrzeugen | [2002/06] | English: | Vehicle turn signal cancel device | [2002/06] | French: | Mécanisme de rappel pour indicateur de direction de véhicule | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 24.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.07.2008 | ES | 20.10.2008 | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/09] | ES | 20.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1266652 (WESTFAELISCHE METALL INDUSTRIE) [A] 1,2,4,9,13,14,18* the whole document *; | [A]DE2201157 (MERIT WERK MERTEN & CO KG) [A] 1,2,4 * figures 11,12 * * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 15 *; | [A]FR2293336 (LUCAS ELECTRICAL CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2,4,9,10,16,17 * abstract *; | [X]DE3510345 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1,3,4,9,10,12-16,18 * column 4, line 55 - column 5 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]DE3443162 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,9-11,13-15,17,18,20 * figure 1 * * pages 6-10 * [Y] 12; | [YA]US4739131 (MAEDA TAKUYA [JP]) [Y] 12 * abstract * [A] 4-8,13,14,16,20; | [PX]DE10030275 (ROBERT SEUFFER GMBH & CO [DE]) [PX] 1-4,9,12,15-17 * column 1, line 48 * * columns 3-7 * * figures 1-14 * |