EP1170513 - Device and its use for releasably fixing at least two flat elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fischbach, Joachim Zogenfeldstrasse 16 88214 Ravensburg / DE | For all designated states Fischbach, Oliver Bischof-Sproll-Weg 15 88212 Ravensburg / DE | For all designated states Leitgeb, Peter Dorf 24 6165 Telfes / AT | For all designated states Müller, Elmar Milders 532 6167 Neustift / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Fischbach, Joachim Zogenfeldstrasse 16 88214 Ravensburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Fischbach, Oliver Bischof-Sproll-Weg 15 88212 Ravenburg / DE | |||
For all designated states Leitgeb, Peter Dorf 24 6165 Telfes / AT | |||
For all designated states Müller, Elmar Milders 532 6167 Neustift / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischbach, Joachim Zogenfeldstrasse 16 88214 Ravensburg / DE | 02 /
Leitgeb, Peter Dorf 24 6165 Telfes / AT | 03 /
Müller, Elmar Milders 532 6167 Neustift / AT | [2002/05] |
Former [2002/02] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Grape, Knut, et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Grape, Knut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113262.8 | 31.05.2001 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | DE2000127896 | 06.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10027896 | DE2000152420 | 23.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10052420 | [2002/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1170513 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1170513 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/00, E06B3/54, E06B3/02, E05D5/02, A47K3/30, A47F3/12 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
E06B3/5445 (EP);
E04B1/6116 (EP);
E05D5/0246 (EP);
E06B3/02 (EP);
E06B3/5436 (EP);
E04B2001/6191 (EP);
E04B2001/6195 (EP);
E05D2005/0253 (EP);
E05D2005/0269 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/02] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur lösbaren Halterung von wenigstens zwei Flächenelementen und deren Verwendung | [2002/02] | English: | Device and its use for releasably fixing at least two flat elements | [2002/02] | French: | Dispositif ainsi que son utilisation pour fixer de manière amovible au moins deux éléments plats | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 29.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19945493 (INTEK GES FUER MODERNE INNENBA [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract ** figures 2,4 * | Examination | US5348778 | EP0841032 |