EP1163838 - Crop harvester, especially a rotobaler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anstey, Henry Dennis 19684 Whiskey Ridge Ottumwa, IA 52501 / US | 02 /
Derscheid, Daniel Eric 26 rue Francois-Nicolas Mouchet 70100 Gray / FR | 03 /
Frimml, Roger William 916 North Court Street Ottumwa, IA 52501 / US | 04 /
Engel, Manfred Neustaessel 12 66484 Grossteinhausen / DE | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al Deere & Company European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113498.8 | 02.06.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | US20000594251 | 15.06.2000 Original published format: US 594251 | [2001/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163838 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1163838 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/10, A01D89/00 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
A01D89/004 (EP,US);
A01F15/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/51] | Title | German: | Erntebergungsmaschine, insbesondere Rundballenpresse | [2001/51] | English: | Crop harvester, especially a rotobaler | [2001/51] | French: | Machine de récolte, notamment presse à balles rondes | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 09.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.10.2007 | DK | 31.10.2007 | FI | 31.10.2007 | IE | 31.10.2007 | NL | 31.10.2007 | TR | 31.10.2007 | SE | 31.01.2008 | GR | 01.02.2008 | ES | 11.02.2008 | PT | 31.03.2008 | AT | 02.06.2008 | LU | 02.06.2008 | BE | 30.06.2008 | CH | 30.06.2008 | LI | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | CY | 31.10.2007 | |
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
AT | 02.06.2008 | ||
LU | 02.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 31.10.2007 | |
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
AT | 02.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 31.10.2007 | |
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | DK | 31.10.2007 | |
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | DK | 31.10.2007 | |
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | DK | 31.10.2007 | |
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | DK | 31.10.2007 | |
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | DK | 31.10.2007 | |
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 31.10.2007 | |
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | NL | 31.10.2007 | |
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | NL | 31.10.2007 | |
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1042682 (FRIEDHELM CLAAS) [X] 1 * page 2, line 100 - line 123 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2; | [A]GB1071658 (PATENT CONCERN NV) [A] 1 * page 1, line 39 - page 3, line 50 * * figures 1,2 *; | [YA]US4085571 (MORTIER FRANS H, et al) [Y] 2 * column 6, line 35 - line 63 * * figures 1,6,7 * [A] 1,3; | [A]DE4028349 (NUSSER JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 54 * * figure 2 *; | [XA]DE29622041U (OTTO GRUBER GES M B H MASCHBAU [AT]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 21 - page 5, line 21 * * figure 2 * [A] 2,3; | [A]US5848523 (ENGEL MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 1 - column 6, line 31 ** figures 1,2 * |