EP1164155 - Polyester resin and molded article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/32] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oguro, Dai, Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Company, Inc. Hiratsuka Research Lab., 6-2, Higashiyata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Koji, Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Company, Inc. Hiratsuka Research Lab., 6-2, Higashiyata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Hayashi, Takeo, Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Company, Inc. Hiratsuka Research Lab., 6-2, Higashiyata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Hirokane, Takeshi, Mitsubishi Gas Chem Company Inc Hiratsuka Research Lab., 6-2, Higashiyata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Kurokawa, Masahiro Mitsubishi Gas Chem Company Inc Hiratsuka Research Lab., 6-2, Higashiyata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113552.2 | 13.06.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | JP20000177070 | 13.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000177070 | JP20000322673 | 23.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000322673 | JP20000370580 | 05.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000370580 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1164155 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1164155 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/00, C08G63/183 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
C08J9/141 (EP,US);
C08G63/183 (KR);
C08G63/672 (EP,US);
C08J2201/03 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2002/37] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Polyester und aus der Schmelze hergestellte Artikel | [2001/51] | English: | Polyester resin and molded article | [2001/51] | French: | Polyester et objets obtenus par moulage | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 20.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62265361 ; | [XD]US2945008 (CALDWELL JOHN R, et al) [XD] 1-6 * claims 2,6,12 * * examples 9,10 * * column 1, line 29 - line 35 * * column 1, line 41 - line 55 * * column 4, line 6 - line 14 * * column 5, line 55 - line 59 * * column 6, paragraph 1 *; | [A]DE2008984 (HOECHST AG) [A] 1-9* page 2, paragraphs 1,2; claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880507), vol. 012, no. 148, Database accession no. (C - 493), & JP62265361 A 19871118 (UNITIKA LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * |