EP1190666 - Valve for a dishwasher with a movable closure device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Muggenhoferstrasse 135 90429 Nürnberg / DE | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckert, Holger Julius-Lossmann-Strasse 108 90469 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Wolfgang Schmidt Auf der Marter 1 D-91238 Engelthal / DE | [2002/34] |
Former [2002/13] | 01 /
Eckert, Holger Julius-Lossmann-Strasse 108 90469 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113590.2 | 15.06.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | DE2000142783 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10042783 | [2002/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1190666 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1190666 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1190666 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] |
Former [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP1190666 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2003/01] | |||
[2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, F16K15/04, F16K11/056 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
A47L15/4221 (EP);
F16K11/044 (EP);
F16K11/056 (EP);
F16K31/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/13] | A47L15/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/48] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ventil für eine Geschirrspülmaschine mit einem beweglich angeordneten Verschliesselement | [2002/13] | English: | Valve for a dishwasher with a movable closure device | [2002/13] | French: | Valve pour lave-vaisselle avec dispositif de fermeture mobile | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2789451 (SIEBE APPLIANCE CONTROLS SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US5486089 (CHUNG UI-SHIK [KR]) [X] 1,6-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US2918927 (CLEARMAN JACK F) [X] 1,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4404369 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0237994 (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |