EP1162822 - Image data transmission system and image data transmission and reception method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/50] | Image data transmission device and method, computer-readable storage medium storing program for transmitting image data, and image data transmission and reception system and method | ||
[2005/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD. 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8550 / JP | [2005/52] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd. 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Usami, Yasushi, c/o Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd. 579-1, Umehara Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8550 / JP | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113841.9 | 06.06.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | JP20000168577 | 06.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000168577 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1162822 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1162822 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1162822 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32, H04N1/00 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
H04N1/0014 (EP,US);
H04N1/46 (KR);
H04N1/00915 (EP,US);
H04N1/00954 (EP,US);
H04N1/0096 (EP,US);
H04N1/32037 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/50] | H04N1/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/24] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bilddatenübertragungssystem und Bilddatenübertragungs- und Empfangsverfahren | [2005/26] | English: | Image data transmission system and image data transmission and reception method | [2005/26] | French: | Système de transmission de données d'image et procédé de transmission et réception de données d'image | [2005/26] |
Former [2001/50] | Bilddatenübertragungsvorrichtung und -Verfahren, computerlesbares Speichermedium, das ein Programm zur Ubertragung von Bilddaten speichert, und Bilddatenübertragungs- und -Empfangssystem und -Verfahren | ||
Former [2001/50] | Image data transmission device and method, computer-readable storage medium storing program for transmitting image data, and image data transmission and reception system and method | ||
Former [2001/50] | Dispositif et procédé de transmission de données d'image, support d'enregistrement lisible par ordinateur qui enregistre un programme pour la transmission de données d'image, et système et procédé de transmission et réception de données d'image | Examination procedure | 23.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 25.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 18.04.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.07.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.04.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 06.06.2006 | FR | 30.06.2006 | [2008/23] |
Former [2007/28] | GB | 06.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5084770 (NAKAYAMA TSUTOMU [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * column 4, line 44 - line 64 * * column 7, line 31 - line 32 * * figure 1 * * column 2, line 14 - line 25 * * column 7, line 1 - line 4 * * column 3, line 29 - line 30 * * column 3, line 41 - line 43 * [Y] 5; | [Y]WO9746002 (FAXFORWARD INC [CA], et al) [Y] 5* page 7, line 11 - page 7, line 13 * |