EP1174353 - Food packaging with stand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Convenience Food Systems Wallau GmbH & Co.KG Im Ruttert 35216 Biedenkopf Wallau / DE | [2002/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fux, Rudolf Habachstrasse 11 35713 Eschenburg / DE | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Wolff, Felix, Dr., et al Kutzenberger & Wolff Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01114159.5 | 11.06.2001 | [2002/04] | Priority number, date | DE20002012640U | 19.07.2000 Original published format: DE 20012640 U | [2002/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1174353 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1174353 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D6/00, B65D21/032, B65D25/24, B65D43/16, B65D75/22 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
B65D43/162 (EP,US);
B65D25/24 (EP,US);
B65D2207/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/04] | B65D6/00, B65D21/032, B65D25/24, B65D43/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/44] |
Former [2007/35] | |||
Former [2002/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Lebensmittelverpackung mit Standhilfe | [2002/04] | English: | Food packaging with stand | [2002/04] | French: | Emballage pour produits alimentaires avec support | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/15] | 17.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.09.2007 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | 07.09.2007 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.09.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   07.09.2007 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.2007 | 30.06.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3575285 (KAHN ROBERT D) [Y] 6,7 * column 1, line 67 - column 4, line 1; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE7837117U (LOHMANN GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1,3,5,8,12,13 * page 4 - page 7; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]DE3545216 (ISI B V [NL]) [Y] 11* column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 7; figures 1-6 *; | [XY]DE9205311U (SILVER-PLASTICS GMBH & CO KG, 5210 TROISDORF, DE) [X] 1-5,8-10,12,13 * page 5, line 25 - page 8, line 31; figures 1-7 * [Y] 6,7,11 |