EP1167010 - Spout sealing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Jidoki Co., Ltd. 27-12, Hamamatsu-cho 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/31] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Toyo Jidoki Co., Ltd. 27-12, Hamamatsu-cho 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiramoto, Shinishi 1808, Nagano, Ooaza Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 02 /
Hirata, Keizo 1808, Nagano, Ooaza Iwakuni-chi, Yamaguchi / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Schubert, Siegmar Patentanwälte Dannenberg Schubert Gudel Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Schubert, Siegmar, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dannenberg Schubert Gudel Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 01114320.3 | 13.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | JP20000180633 | 15.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000180633 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1167010 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1167010 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1167010 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B31B1/84, B31B19/64 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
B29C65/7882 (EP,US);
B29C65/10 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C65/24 (EP,US);
B29C65/305 (EP,US);
B29C65/7855 (EP,US);
B29C66/0242 (EP,US);
B29C66/53262 (EP,US);
B29C66/53263 (EP,US);
B29C66/81427 (EP,US);
B29C66/8161 (EP,US);
B29C66/81812 (EP,US);
B29C66/8226 (EP,US);
B29C66/8227 (EP,US);
B29C66/83511 (EP,US);
B29C66/83543 (EP,US);
B29C65/103 (EP,US);
B29C65/1412 (EP);
B29C65/245 (EP,US);
B29C65/7847 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2002/01] | B31B1/84 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/01] | Title | German: | Methode und Vorrichtung zum Siegeln einer Ausgiesstülle | [2002/01] | English: | Spout sealing method and apparatus | [2002/01] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour sceller un bec verseur | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 29.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2006 | BE | 02.08.2006 | CH | 02.08.2006 | CY | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | LI | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | TR | 02.08.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CY | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH1177860 ; | [DA]JPH11333950 ; | [DA]JPH10202768 ; | [A]US4507168 (KONAKA YUKIO [JP]) [A] 1,6 * column 9, line 17 - column 10, line 6; figure 3; claim 1 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11077860 A 19990323 (FAB TOYAMA:KK;DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [DA] 1,6 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11333950 A 19991207 (SHINSEI:KK) [DA] * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10202768 A 19980804 (FUJI SEAL CO LTD) [DA] * abstract * | by applicant | JPH10202768 | JPH1177860 | JPH11333950 | JP2000036277 |