EP1164566 - Method and device for controlling the illumination of a liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyachi, Koichi 3-9-7, Sakuragaoka Seika-cho Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0232 / JP | 02 /
Jinda, Akihito 107-4, Minami Koryo-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara 635-0818 / JP | 03 /
Shiomi, Makoto 223-1019, Sashiyanagi-cho Tenri-shi, Nara 632-0093 / JP | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Müller . Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01114331.0 | 13.06.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | JP20000180413 | 15.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000180413 | JP20000180423 | 15.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000180423 | JP20000180428 | 15.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000180428 | JP20000180421 | 15.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000180421 | JP20010110515 | 09.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001110515 | JP20010111900 | 10.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001111900 | JP20010110597 | 09.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001110597 | JP20010111918 | 10.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001111918 | JP20010142376 | 11.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001142376 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1164566 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1164566 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G09G3/34 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
G09G3/3413 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G09G3/342 (EP,US);
G09G2310/024 (EP,US);
G09G2310/066 (EP,US);
G09G2310/08 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0261 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0633 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/51] | G09G3/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/07] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Steuerung der Beleuchtung einer Flüssigkristallanzeige | [2001/51] | English: | Method and device for controlling the illumination of a liquid crystal display device | [2001/51] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de commande de l'éclairage d'un dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 29.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/24] | 28.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0478186 (EMI PLC THORN [GB]) [X] 1,15,59 * column 2, line 1 - line 26; figure 2 *[A] 2-14,16-58,60-102 |