EP1148206 - Multi-activity offshore exploration and/or development drilling method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRANSOCEAN SEDCO FOREX INC. Four Greenway Plaza Houston, TX 77046 / US | [2001/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scott, Robert J. 4223 Willowbank Drive Sugarland, TX 77479 / US | 02 /
Herrmann, Robert P. Suite 6, 201 Vanderpool Lane Houston, TX 77024 / US | 03 /
Ray, Donald R. 446 Hollow Drive Houston, TX 77029 / US | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Rupprecht, Kay, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01114469.8 | 27.01.1997 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | US19960642417 | 03.05.1996 Original published format: US 642417 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1148206 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1148206 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E21B15/02, E21B7/12, E21B7/128, E21B15/00 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
E21B15/02 (EP,US);
H04N5/775 (KR);
B63B35/4413 (EP,US);
E21B19/002 (EP,US);
E21B7/12 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für vielfältige Operationen bei Explorations- und/oder Entwicklungsbohrungen in der See | [2001/43] | English: | Multi-activity offshore exploration and/or development drilling method and apparatus | [2001/43] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'exploration du sous-sol marin et/ou de forage de développement permettant des opérations multiples | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 11.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/19] | 02.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97903797.5 / EP0836668 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4208158 (DAVIES PHILIP H [US], et al) [A] 1,8* the whole document *; | [A]GB2041836 (AKERS MEK VERKSTED AS) [A] 1,8 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 16 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4850439 (LUND THOMAS A [DK]) [A] 1,8 * column 8, lines 9-14 * * column 7, lines 3-23 * * figures 1-16 *; | [A]GB2291664 (HEEREMA GROUP SERVICES BV [NL]) [A] 1,8 * page 10, lines 9-22 * * figures 14-16 * |