EP1271452 - Method for displaying posted advertising literature at the letterbox [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/01] | Prospect design | ||
[2004/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kasten, Jens-Uwe Am Park 17 19086 Plate / DE | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/01] | Application number, filing date | 01114565.3 | 18.06.2001 | [2003/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271452 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271452 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09F1/04, G09F23/00 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B42D15/00 (EP);
G09F1/10 (EP);
G09F15/02 (EP);
G09F23/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | Verfahrung zum Sichtbarmachen von Briefkastenwerbung | [2004/05] | English: | Method for displaying posted advertising literature at the letterbox | [2004/05] | French: | Méthode pour rendre visible les publicités postées dans la boîte aux lettres | [2004/05] |
Former [2003/01] | Prospekt- oder Flyergestaltung | ||
Former [2003/01] | Prospect design | ||
Former [2003/01] | Configuration pour prospectus | Examination procedure | 04.07.2001 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 30.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.08.2003 | 30.06.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.08.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.10.2004 | FR | 20.10.2004 | GB | 20.10.2004 | IE | 20.10.2004 | IT | 20.10.2004 | NL | 20.10.2004 | TR | 20.10.2004 | DK | 20.01.2005 | GR | 20.01.2005 | SE | 20.01.2005 | ES | 31.01.2005 | PT | 20.03.2005 | AT | 18.06.2005 | CY | 18.06.2005 | LU | 18.06.2005 | BE | 30.06.2005 | CH | 30.06.2005 | LI | 30.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
IT | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
AT | 18.06.2005 | ||
CY | 18.06.2005 | ||
LU | 18.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
CH | 30.06.2005 | ||
LI | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
AT | 18.06.2005 | ||
CY | 18.06.2005 | ||
LU | 18.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
CH | 30.06.2005 | ||
LI | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
AT | 18.06.2005 | ||
CY | 18.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
CH | 30.06.2005 | ||
LI | 30.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
AT | 18.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
CH | 30.06.2005 | ||
LI | 30.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
AT | 18.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
CH | 30.06.2005 | ||
LI | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/43] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
AT | 18.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
CH | 30.06.2005 | ||
LI | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
CH | 30.06.2005 | ||
LI | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 20.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29814908U (HOPBACH KARL HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1* figure -; claim - *; | [Y]DE20003318U (EWALD ANDREAS [DE]) [Y] 1 * figure - *; | [Y]DE20007916U (HOPBACH KARL HEINZ [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * figure -; claim - * |