EP1168758 - Client/server system and program for application distribution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honda, Makoto Intell. Prop. Div., K.K.Toshiba, 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01114838.4 | 28.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | JP20000196865 | 29.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000196865 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1168758 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H04L67/34 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Client/server- System und Programm zur Anwendungsverteilung | [2002/01] | English: | Client/server system and program for application distribution | [2002/01] | French: | Système client/serveur et programme pour la distribution d'applications | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 24.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |