EP1175955 - Process and device for smoothing a weld seam by beam welding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydro Aluminium Deutschland GmbH Ettore-Bugatti-Strasse 6-14 51149 Köln / DE | [2008/35] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Hydro Aluminium Deutschland GmbH Ettore-Bugatti-Strasse 6-14 51149 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states VAW aluminium AG Georg-von-Boeselager-Strasse 25 53117 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maier, Christof, Dr. Memeler Strasse 5 50733 Köln / DE | 02 /
Steimmel, Franz An der Bendenmühle 9 53619 Rheinbreitbach / DE | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01115266.7 | 23.06.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | DE2000137109 | 27.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10037109 | [2002/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1175955 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1175955 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175955 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23K37/08, B23K26/00, B23K26/24, B23K26/06, B23K26/42 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
B23K26/0619 (EP);
B23K26/0604 (EP);
B23K26/0734 (EP);
B23K26/24 (EP);
B23K26/242 (EP);
B23K26/26 (EP);
B23K26/3576 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/05] | B23K37/08, B23K26/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu Schweissnahtglättung beim Strahlschweissen | [2002/05] | English: | Process and device for smoothing a weld seam by beam welding | [2002/05] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de lissage de cordon soudé au cours du soudage par faisceau | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 20.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | IE | 27.08.2008 | TR | 27.08.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | DK | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 27.08.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5471059 ; | [A]US3437787 (CHYLE JOHN J); | [X]US4914268 (HIXON CHARLES E [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6 * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 68; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5689327 (TAKEDA MINORU [JP]) [A] 9-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US5705788 (BEYER ECKHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * column 5, line 10 - line 39 *; | [X]WO9906173 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-8 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 31; figure 3 *; | [PX]EP1057577 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [PX] 1,3,6,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013]; claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790803), vol. 003, no. 091, Database accession no. (C - 054), & JP54071059 A 19790607 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,6 * abstract * |