EP1271748 - Wheel structure with inner stator and a drive circuit inside of the statorcore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hsu, Chun-Pu No. 19 Wu Chuang Liu Road, Wu Ku Industrial Park Taipei Hsien Taiwan, R.O.C. / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states HSU, Chun-Pu No. 19 Wu Chuang Liu Road, Wu Ku Industrial Park Taipei Hsien, Taiwan, R.O.C. / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Schnekenbühl, Robert DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Marstallstraße 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Schnekenbühl, Robert Matthias L. DTS München Patent- und Rechtsanwälte St.-Anna-Strasse 15 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01115312.9 | 25.06.2001 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271748 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271748 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/04, H02K21/22, H02K7/14, H02K3/52 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H02K3/522 (EP);
H02K11/33 (EP);
H02K21/22 (EP);
H02K7/14 (EP);
H02K2203/03 (EP);
H02K2203/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | Radstruktur mit innenliegendem Ständer und im Ständerkörper integrierter Feldsteuerung | [2003/01] | English: | Wheel structure with inner stator and a drive circuit inside of the statorcore | [2003/01] | French: | Structure de roue avec stateur interne et circuit de puissance integré au corps de stateur | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 17.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.01.2004 | BE | 28.01.2004 | CH | 28.01.2004 | CY | 28.01.2004 | ES | 28.01.2004 | FI | 28.01.2004 | FR | 28.01.2004 | IT | 28.01.2004 | LI | 28.01.2004 | NL | 28.01.2004 | TR | 28.01.2004 | DK | 28.04.2004 | GR | 28.04.2004 | SE | 28.04.2004 | DE | 29.04.2004 | IE | 25.06.2004 | LU | 25.06.2004 | PT | 28.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
CY | 28.01.2004 | ||
ES | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
FR | 28.01.2004 | ||
IT | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
TR | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
IE | 25.06.2004 | ||
LU | 25.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
CY | 28.01.2004 | ||
ES | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
FR | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
TR | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
IE | 25.06.2004 | ||
LU | 25.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
FR | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
TR | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
IE | 25.06.2004 | ||
LU | 25.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
FR | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
IE | 25.06.2004 | ||
LU | 25.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
IE | 25.06.2004 | ||
LU | 25.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
IE | 25.06.2004 | ||
LU | 25.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
LU | 25.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/12] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
SE | 28.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10285891 ; | [A]JPS58127552 ; | [A]EP0722210 (BITRON SPA [IT]) [A] 1,4,6,8,9 * column 3, line 7 - column 5, line 40; figures 2-8,10,15; claim 1 *; | [A]US5654598 (HORSKI MAREK [CA]) [A] 1,2,4,6,8,9 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 45; figures 1-4; claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10285891 A 19981023 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831025), vol. 007, no. 239, Database accession no. (E - 206), & JP58127552 A 19830729 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK) [A] 1,4,6,8,9 * abstract * |