EP1176497 - Input/output apparatus for a data processing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bilke, Volkmar Westring 57 33154 Salzkotten / DE | [2002/05] | Application number, filing date | 01115394.7 | 26.06.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | DE2000135964 | 24.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10035964 | [2002/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1176497 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/023, G06F1/16 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
G06F3/0231 (EP,US);
G06F1/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ein-/Ausgabegerät für eine Datenverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [2002/05] | English: | Input/output apparatus for a data processing device | [2002/05] | French: | Appareil d'entrée/sortie de données pour un dispositif de traitement de données | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/29] | 07.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |