EP1178262 - Non return valve for exhaust duct [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centrotherm Systemtechnik GmbH Am Patbergschen Dorn 9 59929 Brilon / DE | [2006/34] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states CENTROTHERM Abgassystemtechnik GmbH Am Padbergschen Dorn 9 59929 Brilon / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hohmann, Thomas Herfeldstrasse 38 34431 Marsberg-Meerhof / DE | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Hosbach, Hans Ulrich, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Strasse 2 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Hosbach, Hans Ulrich, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2002/06] | Hosbach, Hans Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al ZENZ, HELBER, HOSBACH, LÄUFER, Patentanwälte, Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01115460.6 | 27.06.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | DE2000137967 | 04.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10037967 | [2002/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1178262 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1178262 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F23L11/00 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
F16K15/06 (EP);
F23L11/005 (EP);
F23J2900/13004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Rückströmspeere für eine Abgasleitung | [2002/06] | English: | Non return valve for exhaust duct | [2002/06] | French: | Clapet anti-retour pour conduite de gaz de combustion | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 15.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.12.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | FI | 13.12.2006 | IE | 13.12.2006 | TR | 13.12.2006 | SE | 13.03.2007 | GR | 14.03.2007 | ES | 24.03.2007 | PT | 14.05.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | DK | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 13.12.2006 | |
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 13.12.2006 | |
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 13.12.2006 | |
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 13.12.2006 | |
SE | 13.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1389416 (HASENCLEVER AG MASCHF) [Y] 2-5,8,9 * page 3, column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 37 * * page 4, column 2, line 16 - line 30 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]FR2319848 (GROSS MAURICE [FR]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 2, line 14 - line 22 * * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 17 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-5,8-10; | [A]US4770160 (SCHIMMEYER WERNER K [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2A-2C * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 17 ** column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 46 *; | [A]US5857904 (VAN HORN SAMUEL L [US]) [A] 1 * figure 3 * * column 2, line 22 - line 49 * * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 25 *; | [Y]DE19818521 (CENTROTHERM ABGASTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 10 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 47 - line 64 * | Examination | DE10195 | US3621874 | by applicant | DE19906736 |