EP1167104 - Hybrid vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hisada, Hideki Aisin AW Co.,Ltd., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 444-1192 / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2009/48] |
Former [2002/01] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01115487.9 | 27.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | JP20000194628 | 28.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000194628 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1167104 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1167104 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1167104 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/04, F16H61/12 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
B60W20/50 (EP,US);
B60K28/10 (EP,US);
B60K6/38 (US);
B60K6/383 (EP,US);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60K1/02 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/441 (EP,US);
B60W2050/021 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0638 (EP,US);
B60W2510/081 (EP,US);
B60W2510/083 (EP,US);
B60W2510/244 (EP,US);
B60W2710/083 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y10S477/906 (EP,US);
Y10S903/903 (EP,US);
Y10S903/913 (EP,US);
Y10S903/946 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/03] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hybridfahrzeug | [2002/01] | English: | Hybrid vehicle | [2002/01] | French: | Véhicule hybride | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 30.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.08.2004 | [2007/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5433282 (MOROTO SHUZO [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,7* the whole document *; | [DA]US5788006 (YAMAGUCHI KOZO [JP]) [DA] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5931271 (HAKA RAYMOND JAMES [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19923970 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * |