EP1172228 - Support for lithographic printing plate and pre-sensitized plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Revocation of patent | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawada, Hirokazu Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Uesugi, Akio Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01115697.3 | 05.07.2001 | [2002/03] | Priority number, date | JP20000209821 | 11.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000209821 | [2002/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1172228 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1172228 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1172228 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41N1/08 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
B41N3/034 (EP,US);
B41N1/083 (EP,US);
C22C21/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12736 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12993 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/03] | Title | German: | Träger für eine Flachdruckplatte und vorsensibilisierte Platte | [2002/03] | English: | Support for lithographic printing plate and pre-sensitized plate | [2002/03] | French: | Support pour plaque d'impression et plaque présensibilisée | [2002/03] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 23.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2006
19.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE Hydro Aluminium Deutschland GmbH Ettore-Bugatti-Strasse 6-14 51149 Koeln / DE Opponent's representative Ziebell, Arnd, et al, et al Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2006
Hydro Aluminium Deutschland GmbH Ettore-Bugatti-Strasse 6-14 51149 Koeln / DE Opponent's representative Ziebell, Arnd, et al, et al Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 26.07.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.02.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.10.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/18] | 21.12.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.09.2005 | BE | 21.09.2005 | CH | 21.09.2005 | CY | 21.09.2005 | FI | 21.09.2005 | FR | 21.09.2005 | IT | 21.09.2005 | LI | 21.09.2005 | NL | 21.09.2005 | TR | 21.09.2005 | DK | 21.12.2005 | GR | 21.12.2005 | SE | 21.12.2005 | ES | 01.01.2006 | PT | 21.02.2006 | IE | 05.07.2006 | LU | 05.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
FR | 21.09.2005 | ||
IT | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
TR | 21.09.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
IE | 05.07.2006 | ||
LU | 05.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
IT | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
TR | 21.09.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
IE | 05.07.2006 | ||
LU | 05.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
FR | 20.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
IT | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
IE | 05.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
FR | 20.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
IE | 05.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
FR | 20.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
IE | 05.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 21.09.2005 | |
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CH | 21.09.2005 | |
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
NL | 21.09.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 21.09.2005 | |
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 21.09.2005 | |
SE | 21.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4581996 (PLATZER STEPHAN J [US]) [A] 1-3 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4861396 (MATSUO MAMORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-3* tables 1,5,7 *; | [A]US5104743 (NISHIKAWA YASUHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5731124 (JONCKHEERE MARCUS [BE], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 5, line 30 - line 40; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0960743 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0366] * * examples 6,8,10 * |