EP1177731 - Device and method for producing home-made cigarettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Germany) GmbH Alsterufer 4 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2002/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trinkies, Wolfgang Birkig 26 95497 Goldkronach / DE | 02 /
Burghart, Kurt Hummelstieg 21 22880 Wedel / DE | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01115766.6 | 10.07.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | DE20001033567 | 11.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10033567 | [2002/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1177731 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1177731 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177731 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/42, A24C5/02 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
A24C5/42 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/06] | A24C5/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Selbst- bzw. Einzelverfertigung von Cigaretten | [2002/06] | English: | Device and method for producing home-made cigarettes | [2002/06] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour l'autofabrication de cigarettes | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 22.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 27.04.2005 | IE | 27.04.2005 | IT | 27.04.2005 | TR | 27.04.2005 | AT | 10.07.2005 | CY | 10.07.2005 | LU | 10.07.2005 | DK | 27.07.2005 | GR | 27.07.2005 | SE | 27.07.2005 | CH | 31.07.2005 | LI | 31.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | ES | 07.08.2005 | PT | 10.10.2005 | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/26] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
TR | 27.04.2005 | ||
AT | 10.07.2005 | ||
CY | 10.07.2005 | ||
LU | 10.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
TR | 27.04.2005 | ||
AT | 10.07.2005 | ||
CY | 10.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
TR | 27.04.2005 | ||
AT | 10.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
TR | 27.04.2005 | ||
AT | 10.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
TR | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 27.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0144060 (HARTING ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,16* the whole document *; | [AD]DE3831420 (EFKA WERKE KIEHN GMBH FRITZ [DE]) [AD] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2716344 (DECOUFLE SARL [FR]) [AD] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0823221 (EFKA WERKE KIEHN GMBH FRITZ [DE]) [AD] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19812644 (BAT CIGARETTENFAB GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,16 * the whole document * |