EP1152094 - Mineralwool insulating element and its method of production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/45] | Method for production of insulating elements | ||
[2003/26] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knauf Insulation GmbH Heraklithstrasse 8 84359 Simbach am Inn / DE | [2009/19] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Thüringer Dämmstoffwerke GmbH & Co. KG Am Schlossberg 3 99438 Bad Berka / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gessner, Dieter 99438 Bad Berka / DE | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/45] | Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01116153.6 | 30.07.1998 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | DE1997134532 | 31.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19734532 | DE1997146458 | 21.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19746458 | [2001/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152094 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152094 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/78 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
E04B1/90 (EP);
E04B1/7662 (EP);
E04B1/78 (EP);
E04B2001/7683 (EP);
E04B2001/8471 (EP);
E04B2001/8476 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2003/44] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Dämmelement aus Mineralwolle und Verfahren zur seinen Herstellung | [2003/26] | English: | Mineralwool insulating element and its method of production | [2003/26] | French: | Elément d'isolation en laine de roche et procédé pour sa fabrication | [2003/26] |
Former [2001/45] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Dämmelementen | ||
Former [2001/45] | Method for production of insulating elements | ||
Former [2001/45] | Procédé de fabrication d'éléments d'isolation | Examination procedure | 25.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 21.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98250274.2 / EP0894909 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2004
11.03.2016
WITHDRAWN Deutsche Rockwool Mineralwoll GmbH & Co. OHG Rockwool Str. 37 - 41 45966 Gladbeck / DE Opponent's representative Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel Stenger - Watzke - Ring intellectual property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/16] |
Former [2008/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2004
23.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche Rockwool Mineralwoll GmbH & Co. OHG Rockwool Str. 37 - 41 45966 Gladbeck / DE Opponent's representative Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel Stenger - Watzke - Ring intellectual property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2004
Deutsche Rockwool Mineralwoll GmbH & Co. OHG Rockwool Str. 37 - 41 45966 Gladbeck / DE Opponent's representative Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel Köhne & Wanischeck-Bergmann & Schwarz, Rondorfer Strasse 5a 50968 Köln / DE | 01.03.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.08.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.06.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.06.2006 | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.06.2011 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2011 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 26.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.03.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.04.2016 | 23.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 02.04.2016 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2016/32] | 15.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 22.11.2011 | Appeal received No. T2412/11 | 17.01.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.10.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 23.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.10.2014 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 29.10.2003 | GB | 29.10.2003 | IT | 29.10.2003 | NL | 29.10.2003 | SE | 29.01.2004 | LU | 30.07.2004 | CH | 31.07.2004 | LI | 31.07.2004 | [2007/36] |
Former [2005/25] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
LU | 30.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
LU | 30.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 29.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3223246 (OESTERR HERAKLITH AG [AT]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [XA]WO9416163 (ROCKWOOL INT [DK], et al) [X] 1 * page 19, line 29 - page 24, line 29; figures 8-13 * [A] 2; | [XA]WO9520707 (ROCKWOOL INT [DK], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [PX]DE29714251U (THUERINGER DAEMMSTOFFWERKE GMB [DE]) [PX] 1,2* the whole document * | Examination | DD248934 |