EP1174090 - Clip for use in endoscopic operations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/04] | Instrument for use in endoscopic operations | ||
[2007/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erbengemeinschaft Dr. hc. Karl Storz, vertreten durch Frau Storz-Reling, Sybill Schwabstrasse 28 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2008/14] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Erbengemeinschaft Dr. hc. Karl Storz, vertreten durch Frau Storz-Reling, Sybill Schwabstrasse 28 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Storz, Karl deceased / DE | 02 /
Cuschieri, Alfred Ninewells Hospital and Medical School Dundee DD1 9SY / GB | [2002/22] |
Former [2002/04] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
Cuschieri, Alfred Ninewells Hospital and Medical School Dundee DD1 9SY / GB | Representative(s) | Lohr, Georg Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Lohr, Georg Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Lohr Junkersstrasse 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | ||
Former [2004/04] | Lohr, Georg, Dr. Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Lohr Hauptstrasse 40 82223 Eichenau / DE | ||
Former [2003/50] | Popp, Eugen, Dr. Dr. Münich & Kollegen c/o MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/04] | Münich, Wilhelm, Dr. Dr. Münich & Kollegen Anwaltskanzlei Wilhelm-Mayr-Strasse 11 80689 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01116327.6 | 04.05.1995 | [2002/04] | Priority number, date | DE19944415521 | 04.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4415521 | [2002/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1174090 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1174090 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1174090 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/128, A61B17/122, A61B17/02 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
A61B17/0218 (EP,US);
A61B17/1227 (EP,US);
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2931 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30092 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0019 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/04] | A61B17/128 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/04] | Title | German: | Klemme zum Einsatz bei endoskopischen Eingriffen | [2007/41] | English: | Clip for use in endoscopic operations | [2007/41] | French: | Pince utilisé pour des interventions endoscopiques | [2007/41] |
Former [2002/04] | Instrument zum Einsatz bei endoskopischen Eingriffen | ||
Former [2002/04] | Instrument for use in endoscopic operations | ||
Former [2002/04] | Instrument utilisé pour des interventions endoscopiques | Examination procedure | 06.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 05.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95917265.1 / EP0758214 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2002 | 31.05.2003 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3958576 (KOMIYA OSAMU) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, lines 38-43 *; | [DA]DE3044186 (DERECHINSKY VICTOR EDUARDO) [DA] 1 * page 14, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US4337774 (PERLIN ALFRED R) [A] * column 2, line 52 - line 65 *; | [A]US4706668 (BACKER ROBERT [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 41 - line 42 *; | [A]US4957500 (LIANG MARC D [US], et al) [A] * column 5, line 47 - line 50 *; | [A]WO9213490 (FRIEDLAND THOMAS W [US]) [A] * claim 1 *; | [A]US5242456 (NASH JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 19, lines 32-60 *; | [DA]US5304183 (GOURLAY STUART J [US], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US5304183 |