EP1148049 - Crystalline R-(R*,R*)$-2-(4-fluorophenyl)-beta,delta-dihydroxy-5-(1-methylethyl)-3-phenyl-4- (phenylamino)carbonyl -1H-pyrrole-1-heptanoic acid hemi calcium salt (atorvastatin) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warner-Lambert Company LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | ||
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Briggs, Christopher A. 643 East 12th Street Holland, Michigan 49423 / US | 02 /
Jennings, Rex Allen 405 Lincoln Avenue Holland, Michigan 49423 / US | 03 /
Wade, Robert A. 3882 62nd Street Holland, Michigan 49423 / US | 04 /
Harasawa, Kikuko, 202 Liberty Palace Odakyusagamihara, 18-15 Minamidai 6-chome, Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 228 / JP | 05 /
Ichikawa, Shigeru D-403 Cl-Heights, 1356 Yamasaki-cho Machida-shi, Tokyo 195 / JP | 06 /
Minohara, Kazuo 702 Park Heights Sagamihara, 4-4 Sagamihara 5-chome, Sagamihara shi, Kanagawa 229 / JP | 07 /
Nakagawa, Shinsuke 303 Seishin-Hills, 14-30 Seishin 7-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229 / JP | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Schön, Christoph, et al Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Schön, Christoph, et al Dr. Schön & Partner Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Schön, Christoph Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/43] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01116338.3 | 08.07.1996 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | US19950001452P | 17.07.1995 Original published format: US 1452 P | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1148049 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1148049 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/34, A61K31/40 | [2001/43] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/43] | Extension states | LT | 05.07.2001 | LV | 05.07.2001 | SI | 05.07.2001 | Title | German: | Kristaline (R-(R*,R*))-2-(4-Fluorphenyl)-Beta,Delta-Dihydroxy-5-(1-Methylethyl)-3-Phenyl-4-((Phenylamino)Carbonyl)-1H-Pyrrol-1-Heptancarbonsäure Hemi Calcium Sslz (Atorvastatin) | [2001/43] | English: | Crystalline R-(R*,R*)$-2-(4-fluorophenyl)-beta,delta-dihydroxy-5-(1-methylethyl)-3-phenyl-4- (phenylamino)carbonyl -1H-pyrrole-1-heptanoic acid hemi calcium salt (atorvastatin) | [2001/43] | French: | Formes cristallines d'hémi-sel de calcium d'acide r-(r*,r*) -2-(4-fluorophényl)-beta,delta-dihydroxy-5-(1-methyléthyl)-3-phényl-4- (phenylamino)carbonyl -1h-pyrrole-1-heptanoique (atorvastatine) | [2007/45] |
Former [2001/43] | Formes cristallines d'hémi-sel de calcium d'acide r-(r*,r*)]-2-(4-fluorophényl)-beta,delta-dihydroxy-5-(1-methyléthyl)-3-phényl-4- (phenylamino)carbonyl]-1h-pyrrole-1-heptanoique (atorvastatine) | Examination procedure | 05.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 06.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 19.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96924368.2 / EP0848705 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Gallagher, Kirk James D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Gallagher, Kirk James D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | 21.10.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.06.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.05.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/36] | Appeal following opposition | 10.04.2008 | Appeal received No. T0777/08 | 16.06.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.05.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 24.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.06.2011 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 15.12.2004 | LI | 15.12.2004 | [2011/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0409281 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * example 10 *; | [A]WO9416693 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [A] 1-14* example A *; | [A] - BAUMANN K L ET AL, "THE CONVERGENT SYNTHESIS OF CI-981, AN OPTICALLY ACTIVE, HIGHLY POTENT, TISSUE SELECTIVE INHIBITOR OF HMG-COA REDUCTASE", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19920421), vol. 33, no. 17, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 2283 - 2284, XP000608147 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)74190-6 |