EP1174354 - Transport container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franz Delbrouck GmbH Bieberkamp 51-59 D-58710 Menden / DE | For all designated states Petz, Gertrud Kahle Hege 43 44319 Dortmund / DE | For all designated states Bekuplast Transport- und Lagerbehälter aus Kunststoff Industriestrasse 1 49824 Ringe / DE | For all designated states Ribbeck Gmbh Verpackungs-und Lebensmitteltechnologie Achtern Dieck 9 24576 Bad Bramstedt / DE | [2002/09] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Franz Delbrouck GmbH Bieberkamp 51-59 D-58710 Menden / DE | ||
For all designated states Petz, Gertrud Kahle Hege 43 44319 Dortmund / DE | |||
For all designated states Bekuplast Transport- und Lagerbehälter aus Kunststoff Industriestrasse 1 49824 Ringe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delbrouck, Klaus Franz-Liszt-Strasse 6 50825 Köln / DE | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim Patentanwälte Köchling, Döring PartG mbB Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling, Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01116458.9 | 07.07.2001 | [2002/04] | Priority number, date | DE2000212495U | 19.07.2000 Original published format: DE 20012495 U | [2002/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1174354 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D21/02 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
B65D21/0213 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/04] | Title | German: | Transportbehälter | [2002/04] | English: | Transport container | [2002/04] | French: | Conteneur de transport | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 24.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB892961 (WALTHER ZARGES) [X] 1 * column W *; | [PX]DE19926311 (GOETZ THOMAS [DE]) [PX] 1 * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 35; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0141792 (AKERLUND & RAUSING AB [SE]) [A] 3 * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph L; figure 10 * |