EP1162656 - Filling holes and the like in substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trikon Technologies Limited Coed Rhedyn, Ringland Way Newport Gwent NP6 2TA / GB | [2005/43] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Trikon Technologies Limited Coed Rhedyn, Ringland Way Newport, Gwent NP6 2TA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobson, Christopher David Elberton Old Manor,Elberton, Olveston Bristol BS12 3AA / GB | 02 /
McGeown, Arthur John 1st Floor Flat, 18 Durdham Park Bristol BS6 6XB / GB | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al c/o Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01116591.7 | 04.07.1995 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | GB19940014145 | 13.07.1994 Original published format: GB 9414145 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1162656 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1162656 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1162656 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
H01L21/76846 (EP);
H01L21/3205 (KR);
H01L21/76819 (EP);
H01L21/76843 (EP);
H01L21/76882 (EP);
H05K3/4084 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/43] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Füllen von Löchern und Ähnlichem in Substraten | [2001/50] | English: | Filling holes and the like in substrates | [2001/50] | French: | Remplissage de trous et analogues dans des substrats | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 29.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 22.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95923491.5 / EP0719451 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.10.2005 | [2009/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4906823 (KUSHIMA TADAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [AD]EP0516344 (ELECTROTECH LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-7 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 10 * |